WV SB284 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating WV Health Care Continuity Act
Title
Creating WV Health Care Continuity Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 252) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-26 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 252) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/21/20 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 4u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3ff | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 7u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 8r | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 53 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |