WV SB284 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB284

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing access to career education and workforce training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing access to career education and workforce training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 31) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31HouseTo House Education
2018-01-31HouseTo Education then Finance
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-30SenateOrdered to House
2018-01-30SenateEffective July 1, 2018 (Roll No. 31)
2018-01-31SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 31)
2018-01-30SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-30SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-01-29SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-01-26SenateRead 1st time
2018-01-26SenateOn 1st reading
2018-01-25SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2018-01-24SenateTo Finance
2018-01-24SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2018-01-15SenateTo Education
2018-01-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-15SenateTo Education then Finance
2018-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4267 (Similar To) 2018-01-23 - To House Education
SB284 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - To Government Organization
HB4304 (Similar To) 2018-02-21 - To Health and Human Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1826Amended CodeCitation Text
182E11New CodeSee Bill Text
189A2Amended CodeCitation Text
18C91New CodeSee Bill Text
18C92New CodeSee Bill Text
18C93New CodeSee Bill Text
18C94New CodeSee Bill Text
18C95New CodeSee Bill Text
18C96New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback