WV SB280 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - To House Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing airports' emergency management and operations vehicles to use red flashing warning lights
Title
Allowing airports' emergency management and operations vehicles to use red flashing warning lights
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 28) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2018-01-30 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 28) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-15 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 15 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |