WV SB278 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing various methods to deal with defendant who becomes incompetent during trial
Title
Providing various methods to deal with defendant who becomes incompetent during trial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 296) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 296) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 6A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |