WV SB277 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating COVID-19 Immunity Act
Title
Creating COVID-19 Jobs Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 114) (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 114) (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 114) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 113) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 106) (Y: 31 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 105) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 114) (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 114) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 113) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 106) (Y: 31 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 105) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/19/21 |
2021-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/15/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/21 |
2021-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 114) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 114) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 114) |
2021-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 113) |
2021-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 106) |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 105) |
2021-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2021-03-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-26 | House | Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-22 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Lindsay Floor amendment #2 rejected (Voice vote) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Lindsay Floor amendment #1 rejected (Voice vote) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2021 (Similar To) 2021-02-12 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 19 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 19 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 19 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 19 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 19 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 19 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 19 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 19 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 19 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |