WV SB275 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB275

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating Intermediate Court of Appeals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Intermediate Court of Appeals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - Motion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 641) (Y: 42 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - Motion to table motion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 640) (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 639) (Y: 44 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 598) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Motion to reconsider action as to HFA Zukoff rejected (Roll No. 597) (Y: 45 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 596) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 595) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 92) (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Floor amendments rejected (Roll No. 88) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-06HouseMotion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 641)
2020-03-06HouseMotion to table motion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 640)
2020-03-06HouseMotion to reconsider
2020-03-06HouseHouse rejected (Roll No. 639)
2020-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-05HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 598)
2020-03-05HouseMotion to reconsider action as to HFA Zukoff rejected (Roll No. 597)
2020-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 596)
2020-03-05HouseAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 595)
2020-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-04HousePostponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/5
2020-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-03HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-02HouseWith amendment, do pass
2020-02-29HouseTo House Finance
2020-02-29HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2020-02-11HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-11HouseTo Judiciary then Finance
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-10SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 92)
2020-02-10SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-10SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-07SenateFloor amendments rejected (Roll No. 88)
2020-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-06SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-06SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2020-01-30SenateTo Finance
2020-01-30SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2020-01-10SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-10SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2020-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB275 (Carry Over) 2019-01-11 - To Energy, Industry and Mining

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
162D16aNew CodeSee Bill Text
2311hNew CodeSee Bill Text
2351Amended CodeCitation Text
23510Amended CodeCitation Text
23511Amended CodeCitation Text
23512Amended CodeCitation Text
23513Amended CodeCitation Text
23515Amended CodeCitation Text
23516Amended CodeCitation Text
2353Amended CodeCitation Text
2355Amended CodeCitation Text
2356Amended CodeCitation Text
2358Amended CodeCitation Text
2358aNew CodeSee Bill Text
2359Amended CodeCitation Text
29A54Amended CodeCitation Text
29A61Amended CodeCitation Text
3103aAmended CodeCitation Text
5115New CodeSee Bill Text
51111New CodeSee Bill Text
511110New CodeSee Bill Text
511111New CodeSee Bill Text
511112New CodeSee Bill Text
511113New CodeSee Bill Text
511114New CodeSee Bill Text
51112New CodeSee Bill Text
51113New CodeSee Bill Text
51114New CodeSee Bill Text
51115New CodeSee Bill Text
51116New CodeSee Bill Text
51117New CodeSee Bill Text
51118New CodeSee Bill Text
51119New CodeSee Bill Text
5191aAmended CodeCitation Text
5851Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=275&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB275%20INTR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=275
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB275%20SUB1.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=275
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB275%20SUB2.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=275
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/02-07-0088.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/02-10-0092.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00595.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00596.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00597.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00598.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00639.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00640.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00641.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback