WV SB27 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow police, fire and emergency service providers, to possess Naloxone to administer in suspected narcotic drug overdoses.
Title
Relating to administration of opioid antidote in emergency situations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-03 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2013-03-21 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2013-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |