WV SB267 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to criminal possession of rented or leased personal property
Title
Creating offenses of conversion of leased or rented personal property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 61) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 61) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |