WV SB265 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing DEP to develop Reclamation of Abandoned and Dilapidated Properties Program
Title
Authorizing DEP to develop Reclamation of Abandoned and Dilapidated Properties Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 151) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-18 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 151) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-01-17 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 15A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 15A | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 16 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |