WV SB264 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 72, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring courts to order restitution to crime victims

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring courts to order restitution to crime victims where economically practicable

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 587) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 72, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 587)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseDo pass
2019-03-01HouseTo House Finance
2019-03-01HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-04HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseTo Judiciary then Finance
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-01SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-01SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 55)
2019-02-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-01SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-31SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-31SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-30SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-30SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-29SenateReported do pass
2019-01-22SenateTo Finance
2019-01-22SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-01-11SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-11SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2019-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6111A4Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback