WV SB259 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding Coyote Control Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding Coyote Control Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 147) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-28HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-19HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-19HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-18SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 147)
2019-02-18SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-18SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-15SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-14SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-14SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-24SenateTo Finance
2019-01-24SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2019-01-11SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-11SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance
2019-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB75 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - To Agriculture and Rural Development

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
776eAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback