WV SB253 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB253

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for fair pay and maximized employment of disabled persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for fair pay and maximized employment of disabled persons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 199) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-06HouseFrom House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar
2020-03-06HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-03-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-04HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-04HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseDo pass
2020-02-21HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-21HouseTo Judiciary
2020-02-21HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-21SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 199)
2020-02-21SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-21SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-20SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-20SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-19SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-19SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-18Senate2nd reference dispensed
2020-02-18SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2020-01-10SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-10SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2020-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB253 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1810P1New CodeSee Bill Text
1810P2New CodeSee Bill Text
1810P3New CodeSee Bill Text
1810P4New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback