WV SB248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creating Prosecuting Attorney's Detectives Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Prosecuting Attorney's Detectives Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 240) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-27HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-26SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-26SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 240)
2019-02-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-25SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-23SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-23SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-22Senate2nd reference dispensed
2019-02-22SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-01-10SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-10SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2019-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2444 (Similar To) 2019-01-15 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
74A1New CodeSee Bill Text
74A10New CodeSee Bill Text
74A2New CodeSee Bill Text
74A3New CodeSee Bill Text
74A4New CodeSee Bill Text
74A5New CodeSee Bill Text
74A6New CodeSee Bill Text
74A7New CodeSee Bill Text
74A8New CodeSee Bill Text
74A9New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback