WV SB242 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Restricting authority to prevent or limit owner's use of natural resources or real property in certain agricultural operations
Title
Restricting authority to prevent or limit owner's use of natural resources or real property in certain agricultural operations
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 553) (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 88) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 88) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 553) |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 88) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8A | 7 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |