WV SB242 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB242

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring health insurance providers provide coverage for certain Lyme disease treatment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring health insurance providers provide coverage for certain Lyme disease treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 398) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-20SenateApproved by Governor 3/20/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/18
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal
2018-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 398)
2018-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-05HouseDo pass
2018-03-02HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-03-02HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-02-01HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2018-02-01HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2018-02-01HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-31SenateOrdered to House
2018-01-31SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38)
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-31SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-01-30SenateMaroney Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2018-01-30SenateTakubo Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2018-01-30SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-30SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-01-29SenateRead 1st time
2018-01-29SenateOn 1st reading
2018-01-26SenateReported do pass
2018-01-11SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2018-01-12SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-11SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2018-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4328 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - To House Banking and Insurance
SB242 (Carry Over) 2017-02-23 - To House Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33154lNew CodeSee Bill Text
33154pNew CodeSee Bill Text
33163xNew CodeSee Bill Text
33163zzNew CodeSee Bill Text
3325A8lNew CodeSee Bill Text
3325A8pNew CodeSee Bill Text
33638New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback