WV SB242 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide misdemeanor criminal penalties for using automated telephone calls to disseminate false, misleading or deceptive information with the intent to create panic, incite violence or cause harm to individuals during a declared state of emergency or state of preparedness.
Title
Creating criminal penalties for certain automated telephone calls during state of emergency or preparedness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 565) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 195, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/20/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/15 |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 565) |
2015-03-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-14 | House | Amendment ruled not germane |
2015-03-14 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2015-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2117 (Same As) 2015-01-20 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security