WV SB241 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 251, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to Patient Brokering Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Brokering Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 153) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 153) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 87) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 86) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 90) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateChapter 251, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
2023-02-20SenateApproved by Governor 2/17/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-02-17SenateApproved by Governor 2/17/2023
2023-02-20HouseApproved by Governor 2/17/2023 - House Journal
2023-02-14HouseTo Governor 2/13/2023 - House Journal
2023-02-14SenateTo Governor 2/13/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-02-13SenateTo Governor 2/13/2023
2023-02-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2023-02-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2023-02-09SenateCommunicated to House
2023-02-09SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 153)
2023-02-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 153)
2023-02-09SenateHouse Message received
2023-02-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-02-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 87)
2023-02-08HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-02-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 86)
2023-02-08HouseRead 3rd time
2023-02-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-07HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-02-07HouseRead 2nd time
2023-02-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-06HouseRead 1st time
2023-02-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-03HouseWith amendment, do pass
2023-01-31HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2023-01-31HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2023-01-31HouseIntroduced in House
2023-01-30SenateOrdered to House
2023-01-30SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 90)
2023-01-30SenateRead 3rd time
2023-01-30SenateOn 3rd reading
2023-01-27SenateRead 2nd time
2023-01-27SenateOn 2nd reading
2023-01-26SenateRead 1st time
2023-01-26SenateOn 1st reading
2023-01-25SenateReported do pass
2023-01-16SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2023-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-01-16SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2023-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2544 (Similar To) 2023-01-13 - To House Health and Human Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16622Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=241&year=2023&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb241%20intr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=241
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb241%20enr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=241
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/sb241%20h%20hhr%20am%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/com_amends/sb241%20h%20hhr%20am%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb241%20hfat%20summers%202-5.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb241%20hfat%20summers%202-5%20adopted%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb241%20hfat%20summers%202-5%20adopted.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/senate/01-30-0090.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00086.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00087.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/senate/02-09-0153.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback