WV SB241 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting county court clerks scan certain documents in electronic form

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting county court clerks scan certain documents in electronic form

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 746) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 546) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 517) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 31) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 746)
2019-03-09HouseConference report received-House
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-09SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 546)
2019-03-09HouseConference report filed - House
2019-03-09SenateConference report filed - Senate
2019-03-09SenateTo conference
2019-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-09SenateSenate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Sypolt, Swope, Facemire
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HouseHouse appointed conferees: Martin, C., Worrell, Hicks
2019-03-08HouseHouse refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
2019-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-08SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-08SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 517)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-27HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-27HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2019-01-29HouseTo House Political Subdivisions
2019-01-29HouseTo Political Subdivisions then Government Organization
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-28SenateOrdered to House
2019-01-28SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 31)
2019-01-28SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-28SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-24SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-24SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-10SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-10SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39111Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback