WV SB240 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Department of Administration to promulgate a legislative rule relating to State Owned Vehicles.
Title
Authorizing Department of Administration promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Karen Facemyer [R] | Sen. John Fanning [D] | Sen. Joseph Minard [D] |
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 116, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/22/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/22/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-22 | Approved by Governor 3/22/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/19/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/10 | |
2010-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-11 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-11 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 3) | |
2010-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 212) | |
2010-03-09 | Passed House (Roll No. 211) | |
2010-03-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-09 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-08 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-05 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-02-24 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-24 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-23 | Ordered to House | |
2010-02-23 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) | |
2010-02-23 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) | |
2010-02-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-23 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-22 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-19 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-19 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-18 | Committee substitute reported | |
2010-02-03 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-03 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-01-20 | To Government Organization | |
2010-01-20 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-20 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=240&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |