WV SB239 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to engage behavioral health and substance use disorder providers, municipal leaders, and county government leaders to study a breakdown of homeless demographic information throughout West Virginia; and report the findings of the study to the President of the Senate, Speaker of the House of Delegates, and the Joint Committee of Finance and Finance.
Title
Requiring Commissioner of Bureau for Behavioral Health to engage certain providers and leaders to study homeless demographic
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 149) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 89) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 89) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 186, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/24/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/24/2023 |
2023-02-25 | House | Approved by Governor 2/24/2023 - House Journal |
2023-02-20 | House | To Governor 2/20/2023 - House Journal |
2023-02-21 | Senate | To Governor 2/20/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-02-20 | Senate | To Governor 2/20/22023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-02-15 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 149) |
2023-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-10 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2023-02-10 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-31 | House | To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
2023-01-31 | House | To Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 89) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-01-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-16 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-16 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2545 (Similar To) 2023-01-13 - To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse
SB224 (Similar To) 2023-02-02 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
SB224 (Similar To) 2023-02-02 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading