WV SB239 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-09 - Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-09 - Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to protect an employee’s wages or salaries from being withheld or diverted for political activities without the express, written authorization of the employee. The bill makes clear that it is unlawful for any person to coerce or intimidate any employee into making a political contribution or engaging in political activities. The bill also makes it an unfair labor practice for any labor organization to use agency shop fees paid for by nonmembers for contributions or expenditures to influence an election without the authorization of the individual.
Title
Limiting use of wages by employers and labor organizations for political activities
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 474) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 497) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 66) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Motion to refer to Finance rejected (Roll No. 65) (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 497) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 66) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Motion to refer to Finance rejected (Roll No. 65) (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 474) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 497) |
2017-04-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2017-04-07 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 4/5/17 |
2017-04-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 4/4/17 |
2017-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 66) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion to refer to Finance rejected (Roll No. 65) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Workforce |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Workforce then Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2583 (Similar To) 2017-02-21 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 8 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |