WV SB238 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 259, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing fines for passing stopped school bus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing certain penalties for illegally passing stopped school bus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 516) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 214) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 259, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 516)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseDo pass
2019-02-26HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-26HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-25SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 214)
2019-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-25SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-23SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-22SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-22SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-21SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-23SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-23SenateReported do pass, but first to Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-10SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17C127Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback