WV SB237 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Improving ability of law enforcement to locate and return missing persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving ability of law enforcement to locate and return missing persons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 452) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 95) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-05HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 452)
2019-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseDo pass
2019-02-11HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-08SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-08SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 95)
2019-02-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-06SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-06SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-10SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-10SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
153C1New CodeSee Bill Text
153C2New CodeSee Bill Text
153C3New CodeSee Bill Text
153C4New CodeSee Bill Text
153C5New CodeSee Bill Text
153C6New CodeSee Bill Text
153C7New CodeSee Bill Text
153C8New CodeSee Bill Text
61517Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback