WV SB237 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Tax Department rule relating to farm to food bank tax credit
Title
Authorizing Department of Revenue promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 185) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 185) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 189) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 185) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 189) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/6/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/6/18 |
2018-03-03 | House | To Governor 3/2/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-03 | Senate | To Governor 3/2/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-02 | Senate | To Governor 3/2/18 |
2018-02-27 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 185) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 185) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-22 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 189) |
2018-02-22 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 188) |
2018-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-11 | Senate | To Finance then Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4102 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |