WV SB233 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to age requirements for deputy sheriff

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to age requirements for deputy sheriff

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 495) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 54) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2019-03-08HouseFrom Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Roll No. 495)
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-04HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-04HouseTo Government Organization
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-01SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-01SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 54)
2019-02-01SenateReported by clerk
2019-01-31SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/31/19
2019-01-30SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/30/19
2019-01-29SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/29/19
2019-01-28SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/28/19
2019-01-28SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-28SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-25SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-24SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-24SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-23SenateReported do pass
2019-01-10SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-10SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7148Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback