WV SB233 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill
Title
Budget Bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance on 3rd reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-01-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
Same As/Similar To
hb2016 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Chapter 15, Acts, Regular Session, 2015