WV SB232 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to punishment for second or third offense felony
Title
Relating to punishment for third offense felony
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 552) (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 248) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 248) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 552) |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Do pass |
2022-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 248) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 11 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |