WV SB224 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal the requirement for an employer’s bond for wages and benefits for certain designated employers and related requirements.
Title
Repealing requirement for employer's bond for wages and benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 599) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 529) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 322) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 50) (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 529) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 322) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 50) (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 137, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 599) |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference report received-House |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 529) |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2017-04-08 | Senate | To conference |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Swope, Karnes, Ojeda |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | House appointed conferees: Hanshaw, Foster, G., Fleischauer |
2017-04-07 | House | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-03 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 322) |
2017-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-01 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-07 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 56) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 50) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Workforce |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Workforce then Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 5 | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 14a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |