WV SB221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to change the experience requirements for members and reduce the number of members of the Public Employees Insurance Agency Finance Board.
Title
Relating to composition of PEIA Finance Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 509) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House reconsideration failed (Roll No. 508) (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-07 - House - House receded (Roll No. 507) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 347) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 55) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 54) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House reconsideration failed (Roll No. 508) (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-07 - House - House receded (Roll No. 507) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 347) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 55) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 54) (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 102, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-13 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 509) |
2017-04-07 | House | House reconsideration failed (Roll No. 508) |
2017-04-07 | House | Motion to reconsider |
2017-04-07 | House | House receded (Roll No. 507) |
2017-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 347) |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-07 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-03-07 | House | To Government Organization |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 55) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 54) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |