WV SB216 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Department of Commerce to promulgate a legislative rule relating to tourism development districts.
Title
Authorizing Department of Commerce to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 112) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 112) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 109) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 108) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 112) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 109) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 108) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 175, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/16/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/16/21 |
2021-03-17 | House | Approved by Governor 3/16/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-16 | House | To Governor 3/15/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/21 |
2021-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 112) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 112) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 109) |
2021-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee title amendment withdrawn (Voice) |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 108) |
2021-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice) |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2021-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-02-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-02-18 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2392 (Similar To) 2021-02-13 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |