WV SB2003 | 2017 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Chapter 2, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to provide an efficient, fast and fair merit based system of hiring new employees and retaining current employees while maintaining the current protections afforded under the classified service. Without this bill, Division of Highways will not be able to meet the current demand for employees to maintain our roads and highways much less, the increased demand triggered by increased funding for highway construction. Without this bill, the Tax Division will not be able to meet the current demand for employees to administer, collect and enforce the tax laws of this state. This bill shortens time frames for completing personnel actions by the Division of Highways, the Tax Division and the Division of Personnel. It reduces the duplicative multi-level approvals of personnel decisions but retains due process protections. The Joint Committee on Government and Finance will receive quarterly reports from the Division of Highways and the Division of Personnel and both agencies are required to jointly propose emergency and legislative rules to effectuate the provisions of this section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing special hiring procedures for DOH and Tax Division

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 15) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 14) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 704) (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 703) (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 699) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-24SenateChapter 2, Acts, 2nd Extraordinary Session, 2017
2017-11-13SenateApproved by Governor 10/24/17 - Senate Journal
2017-10-24SenateApproved by Governor 10/24/17
2017-11-13SenateTo Governor 10/20/17 - Senate Journal
2017-10-20SenateTo Governor 10/20/17
2017-10-17SenateCompleted legislative action
2017-10-17SenateCommunicated to House
2017-10-17SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 15)
2017-10-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 14)
2017-10-17SenateHouse Message received
2017-10-17HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-10-17HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 704)
2017-10-17HousePassed House (Roll No. 703)
2017-10-17HouseResumed consideration
2017-10-17HousePostponed consideration until 8:30pm
2017-10-17HouseRead 3rd time
2017-10-17HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2017-10-17HouseRead 2nd time
2017-10-17HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 699)
2017-10-17HouseRead 1st time
2017-10-17HouseImmediate consideration
2017-10-17HouseReference dispensed
2017-10-17HouseIntroduced in House
2017-10-17SenateOrdered to House
2017-10-17SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 7)
2017-10-17SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 7)
2017-10-17SenateRead 3rd time
2017-10-17SenateConstitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 6)
2017-10-17SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2017-10-17SenateRead 2nd time
2017-10-17SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-10-16SenateRead 1st time
2017-10-16SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2017-10-16SenateImmediate consideration
2017-10-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-10-16SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11B18New CodeSee Bill Text
172A24New CodeSee Bill Text
2964aNew CodeSee Bill Text
2964bNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2003&year=2017&sessiontype=2X&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb2003%20intr.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=2X&i=2003
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb2003%20eng.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=2X&i=2003
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb2003%20enr.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=2X&i=2003
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/senate/10-17-0006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/senate/10-17-0007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/house/00699.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/house/00703.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/house/00704.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/senate/10-17-0014.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/2X/votes/senate/10-17-0015.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback