WV SB200 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow leashed dogs to track wounded elk, turkey, bear and wild boar when hunting.
Title
Allowing leashed dogs to track wounded elk, turkey, and wild boar when hunting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-11 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 577) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 640) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 62) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 640) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 62) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 577) |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 640) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-02-21 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2023-01-24 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-01-24 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2023-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 62) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 1/19/2023 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-01-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-13 | Senate | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-13 | Senate | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 5j | Amended Code | Citation Text |