WV SB200 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the eyewitness identification act by authorizing legislative rules for the creation of a more detailed and successful eyewitness identification process.
Title
Relating to Eyewitness Identification Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 66) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 302) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 302) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 79, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/26/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-26 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 66) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 302) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-03-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2758 (Same As) 2013-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1E | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 1E | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
62 | 1E | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |