WV SB199 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Ordered to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Ordered to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Bill
Title
Budget Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 365) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 364) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Motion to read first time adopted (Roll No. 328) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 364) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Motion to read first time adopted (Roll No. 328) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 365) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 364) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Motion to read first time adopted (Roll No. 328) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |