WV SB196 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 108, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 108, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Division of Rehabilitation Services promulgate legislative rule relating to Ron Yost Personal Assistance Services Act Board
Title
Authorizing Division of Rehabilitation Services promulgate legislative rule relating to Ron Yost Personal Assistance Services Board
Sponsors
Sen. Herb Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 318) (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 317) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 317) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 108, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 318) |
2014-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 317) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2014-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-01-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-01-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |