WV SB193 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to law-enforcement certification generally
Title
Relating to law-enforcement certification generally
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 107, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/23/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/23/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 62) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 403) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | Amendment reported by the Clerk | |
2011-03-12 | Reordered on the calendar | |
2011-03-12 | Placed at foot of bills on third reading | |
2011-03-12 | Placed on Special Calender | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Amended to include the provisions of H. B. 3096 | |
2011-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-07 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-02-23 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-22 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-22 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2011-02-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-22 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-21 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-18 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-18 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-17 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-01-18 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-18 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-18 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2538 (Same As) 2011-01-18 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 29 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 29 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 29 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 29 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 29 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |