WV SB191 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating felony offense of aggravated cruelty to animals
Title
Creating felony offense of aggravated cruelty to animals
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. William Ihlenfeld [D] |
Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 37) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |