WV SB188 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to encourage development, transportation and use of electricity generated using West Virginia natural gas as the energy source for generating electricity by directing the West Virginia Department of Economic Development to identify and designate sites suitable for natural gas electric generation facilities and by providing for timely consideration and decision concerning applications for permits to construct and operate natural gas electric generation facilities and by requiring the Air Quality Board to promptly hear and issue decisions on appeals of permit decisions concerning natural gas electric generation facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grid Stabilization and Security Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 376) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 441) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 437) (Y: 41 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 116) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateChapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
2023-03-11HouseApproved by Governor 3/28/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-11SenateApproved by Governor 3/28/2023 - Senate Journal
2023-03-28SenateApproved by Governor 3/28/2023
2023-03-08SenateTo Governor 3/8/2023
2023-03-08HouseTo Governor 3/8/2023 - House Journal
2023-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2023-03-06SenateCompleted legislative action
2023-03-06SenateCommunicated to House
2023-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 376)
2023-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2023-03-03HouseCommunicated to Senate
2023-03-03HousePassed House (Roll No. 441)
2023-03-03HouseRead 3rd time
2023-03-03HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2023-03-02HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 437)
2023-03-02HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2023-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2023-03-02HouseFrom House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar
2023-03-02HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2023-02-15HousePlaced on House Calendar
2023-02-15HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-14HousePostponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/15
2023-02-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-13HouseRead 1st time
2023-02-13HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2023-02-10HouseDo pass
2023-02-07HouseTo House Economic Development and Tourism
2023-02-07HouseTo Economic Development and Tourism
2023-02-07HouseIntroduced in House
2023-02-01SenateOrdered to House
2023-02-01SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 116)
2023-02-01SenateRead 3rd time
2023-02-01SenateOn 3rd reading
2023-01-31SenateRead 2nd time
2023-01-30SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 1/30/2023
2023-01-30SenateOn 2nd reading
2023-01-27SenateRead 1st time
2023-01-27SenateOn 1st reading
2023-01-26SenateCommittee substitute reported
2023-01-13SenateTo Economic Development
2023-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2023-01-13SenateTo Economic Development
2023-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22511BNew CodeSee Bill Text
22B17Amended CodeCitation Text
5B2N1New CodeSee Bill Text
5B2N2New CodeSee Bill Text
5B2N3New CodeSee Bill Text
5B2N4New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=188&year=2023&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb188%20intr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=188
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb188%20sub1.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=188
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb188%20sub1%20enr.htm&yr=2023&sesstype=RS&i=188
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb188%20sub%20hfa%20foster%202-16%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb188%20sub1%20hfa%20foster%202-28%20_2.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb188%20sub%20hfa%20howell%203-2%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb188%20sub%20hfa%20foster%203-2%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb188%20sub%20hfa%20howell%203-2%20_1%20adopted.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2023/RS/floor_amends/sb188%20sub%20hfa%20foster%203-2%20_1%20rejected.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/senate/02-01-0116.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00437.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/house/00441.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2023/RS/votes/senate/03-06-0376.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback