WV SB188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to correct the definition of telehealth in the medication assisted treatment portion of the code.
Title
Correcting definition of "telehealth" in medication-assisted treatment programs
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 71) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/13/17 - House Journal |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/13/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/13/17 |
2017-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/10/17 - House Journal |
2017-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/17 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 71) |
2017-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-23 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senator Jeffries requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2460 (Similar To) 2017-02-24 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5Y | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |