WV SB185 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to refine, revise and modernize the alternative fuel motor vehicle infrastructure credit and alternative fuel motor vehicle credit to more closely align the code with specific intended economic development goals and budgetary goals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to alternative-fuel motor vehicles and qualified refueling infrastructure tax credits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 373) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 372) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-15SenateChapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
2013-04-17HouseApproved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal
2013-04-17SenateApproved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal
2013-05-03SenateApproved by Governor 5/3/13
2013-04-17HouseTo Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal
2013-04-17SenateTo Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal
2013-05-01SenateTo Governor 5/1/13
2013-04-13SenateHouse Message received
2013-04-13HouseCompleted legislative action
2013-04-13HouseCommunicated to Senate
2013-04-13HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 373)
2013-04-13HousePassed House (Roll No. 372)
2013-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-13HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2013-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-12HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2013-04-11HouseRead 1st time
2013-04-11HouseFrom House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
2013-04-10HouseDo pass
2013-04-02HouseTo House Finance
2013-04-02HouseTo Finance
2013-04-02HouseIntroduced in House
2013-04-01SenateOrdered to House
2013-04-01SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 2)
2013-04-01SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 2)
2013-04-01SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-01SenateOn 3rd reading
2013-03-29SenateRead 2nd time
2013-03-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2013-03-28SenateRead 1st time
2013-03-28SenateOn 1st reading
2013-03-27SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2013-03-22SenateTo Finance
2013-03-22SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2013-02-15SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2013-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2013-02-15SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance
2013-02-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2506 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - To House Roads and Transportation
HB2807 (Similar To) 2013-03-04 - To House Education

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
116D1Amended CodeCitation Text
116D10New CodeSee Bill Text
116D2Amended CodeCitation Text
116D3Amended CodeCitation Text
116D4Amended CodeCitation Text
116D5Amended CodeCitation Text
116D6Amended CodeCitation Text
116D7Amended CodeCitation Text
116D9Amended CodeCitation Text
22A266Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=185&year=2013&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb185%20intr.htm&yr=2013&sesstype=RS&i=185
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB185%20SUB1.htm&yr=2013&sesstype=RS&i=185
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB185%20SUB2.htm&yr=2013&sesstype=RS&i=185
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb185%20intr.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=RS&i=185
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB185%20SUB1.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=RS&i=185
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB185%20SUB2.htm&yr=2011&sesstype=RS&i=185
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB185%20SUB2%20ENR.htm&yr=2013&sesstype=RS&i=185
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2013/RS/votes/senate/04-01-0002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2013/RS/votes/house/00372.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2013/RS/votes/house/00373.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback