WV SB18 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to crimes committed on State Capitol Complex

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to crimes committed on State Capitol Complex

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 131) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 130) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 22) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-02-26HouseApproved by Governor 2/25/19 - House Journal
2019-02-25SenateApproved by Governor 2/25/19
2019-02-20SenateTo Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-02-19SenateTo Governor 2/19/19
2019-02-19HouseTo Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal
2019-02-14SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-13HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-02-13HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-13HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 131)
2019-02-13HousePassed House (Roll No. 130)
2019-02-13HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-13HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-12HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-12HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-11HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-11HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-08HouseDo pass
2019-01-24HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseTo Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-23SenateOrdered to House
2019-01-23SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 22)
2019-01-23SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22)
2019-01-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-23SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-22SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-01-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-22SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-21SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-21SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-18SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-09SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2092 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61619Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=18&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB18%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=18
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB18%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=18
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB18%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=18
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB18%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=18
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/01-23-0022.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00130.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00131.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback