WV SB18 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring alcohol awareness education courses for certain employees of retailers and licensed private clubs
Title
Requiring alcohol awareness education courses for certain employees of retailers and licensed private clubs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-01 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-01 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2011-03-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-25 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-25 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-24 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-01-12 | To Finance | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-12 | To Finance | |
2011-01-12 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 3A | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 3A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |