WV SB160 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcohol Beverage Control Commission rule relating to private club licensing
Title
Authorizing Department of Revenue to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 169) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 169) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 235) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 234) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 59) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 169) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 235) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 234) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 59) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/21 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-25 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/21 |
2021-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-24 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 169) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 169) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 235) |
2021-03-22 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 234) |
2021-03-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-03-03 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-03 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 59) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2405 (Similar To) 2021-02-13 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |