WV SB160 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Voluntary WVU Rifle Team Check-Off Program on hunting and fishing licenses
Title
Creating Voluntary WVU Rifle Team Check-Off Program on hunting and fishing licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Charles Clements [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. John Pitsenbarger [R] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 293) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 293) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2020-01-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2020-01-09 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-09 | Senate | To Natural Resources then Finance |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |