WV SB157 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Administration rule relating to purchasing
Title
Authorizing Department of Administration promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 393) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 392) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 82) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 82) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 392) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 82) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 82) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 159, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | To Governor 3/8/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | To Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-28 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 393) |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 392) |
2019-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-07 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 82) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 82) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2231 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |