WV SB157 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcohol Beverage Control Commission rule relating to nonintoxicating beer licensing and operations and procedures
Title
Authorizing Department of Revenue to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 659) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Roll No. 658) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - Motion to reconsider (Roll No. 657) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - Immediate consideration (Roll No. 656) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 442) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 442) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 495) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 494) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 477) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Roll No. 658) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - Motion to reconsider (Roll No. 657) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - Immediate consideration (Roll No. 656) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 442) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 442) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 495) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 494) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 477) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/21/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/16 |
2016-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 659) |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and adopted (Roll No. 658) |
2016-03-12 | House | Motion to reconsider (Roll No. 657) |
2016-03-12 | House | Immediate consideration (Roll No. 656) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Trump, Blair, Kirkendoll |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 442) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 442) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 495) |
2016-03-11 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 494) |
2016-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2016-03-10 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 477) |
2016-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-01-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-01-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Having been read 3rd time 1/26/16 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 1/26/16 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4088 (Similar To) 2016-01-18 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |