WV SB154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 90, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 90, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Using school facilities for funeral and memorial services for certain community members
Title
Using school facilities for funeral and memorial services for certain community members
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 559) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 365) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 443) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 81) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 365) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 443) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 81) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 90, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 559) |
2019-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 365) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 443) |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-07 | House | To House Education |
2019-02-07 | House | To Education |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 81) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Education |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | To Education |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |