WV SB153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing greater flexibility for making infrastructure project grants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing greater flexibility for making infrastructure project grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 513) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 126) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 513)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseImmediate consideration
2019-03-05HouseCommittee discharged as to S. B. 153
2019-02-26HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-26HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-14HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-02-14HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Finance
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-13SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 126)
2019-02-13SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-12SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 2/12/19
2019-02-12SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-11SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-11SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-08SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-08SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-07Senate2nd reference dispensed
2019-02-07SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2019-01-10SenateTo Economic Development
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-10SenateTo Economic Development then Finance
2019-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3115A10Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback