WV SB153 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Reported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Agriculture rule relating to livestock care standards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Agriculture rule relating to livestock care standards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-02SenateReported in Com. Sub. for S. B. 159
2016-01-19SenateTo Judiciary
2016-01-19SenateReported do pass, but first to Judiciary
2016-01-13SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2016-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2016-01-13SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development then Judiciary
2016-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4085 (Similar To) 2016-01-20 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback