WV SB149 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain veterans from concealed weapons license fees
Title
Exempting certain veterans from concealed weapons license fees
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 38) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 38) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Military |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Military then Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2672 (Similar To) 2019-02-15 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |